|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1923 | 29/12/1923 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1256c |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1924 | 10/05/1924 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6256 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1926 | 18/12/1926 | 67 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1929 | 30/03/1929 | 55 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1930 | 27/01/1931 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1933 | 06/05/1933 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1935 | 03/08/1935 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1938 | 19/03/1938 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1940 | 05/10/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1943 | 27/03/1943 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1948 | 17/06/1948 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63846 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22165 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1956 | 21/04/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22878 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1960 | 19/05/1960 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2044 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22138 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2836 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
20/12/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 29/12/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1256c |
||
29/12/1923 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
27/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6256 |
||
16/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
13/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1926. Dep: 18/12/1926. | ||
04/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1929. Dep: 30/03/1929. | ||
29/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1930. Dep: 27/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1885 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1935. Dep: 03/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
11/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
21/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3846 | ||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 17/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63846 |
||
26/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22165 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/07/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. | ||
08/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22878 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/03/1960. Dep: 19/05/1960. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
01/03/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
02/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63846 from Langwith Junction (41J) |