Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 178 Today
» 977 Yesterday
» 4174 Week
» 11358 Month
» 319339 Year
» 1203720 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2046 m/e 05/1919
LNWR 2837 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6290   22/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3847   05/12/1946
BR 63847 w/e 24/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1919
O4/222/08/1924
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22139
To Service During 05/1919
Taken into Stock 22/08/1924
Withdrawal Mon 04/05/1959 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs , 4 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
THJ Thornton Junction 22/08/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 28/07/1943
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
38D Staveley (G.C.) 18/03/1951
   Withdrawn 04/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) m/e 31/03/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   04/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1469)
08/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1474)
29/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1041)
01/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3237)
19/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1029)
01/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3368)
24/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3249)
12/05/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3226)
24/09/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3312)
10/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22265)
01/01/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22147)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 22/02/1924 22/08/1924 183 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6290
 
Cowlairs Works 29/12/1926 18/03/1927 80 days General  
Cowlairs Works 13/03/1929 30/04/1929 49 days General  
Cowlairs Works 10/07/1931 28/10/1931 111 days General  
Cowlairs Works 22/01/1932 02/02/1932 12 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 18/05/1932 11/08/1932 86 days General  
Gorton Works 08/12/1933 08/01/1934 32 days General
Boiler number C1474 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1935 29/01/1936 55 days General
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1938 01/06/1938 51 days General
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1940 19/10/1940 25 days General
Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1943 01/05/1943 34 days General
Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1945 24/03/1945 37 days General
After collision
Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1947 12/05/1947 59 days General
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1949 24/09/1949 27 days General
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63847
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1950 16/12/1950 47 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1952 10/05/1952 35 days General
Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1954 01/01/1955 45 days General
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1955 11/01/1955 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/04/1959 23/04/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2046
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22139
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2837    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1924. Dep: 22/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6290
   
22/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
22/08/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1926. Dep: 18/03/1927.    
13/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1929. Dep: 30/04/1929.    
10/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1931. Dep: 28/10/1931.    
22/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1932. Dep: 02/02/1932.    
18/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1932. Dep: 11/08/1932.    
08/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1933. Dep: 08/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1474 (Diagram 15)
   
06/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1935. Dep: 29/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
   
12/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1938. Dep: 01/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
   
25/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
   
29/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
16/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
05/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3847    
15/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 12/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
29/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63847
   
31/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
18/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
06/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1954. Dep: 01/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
   
05/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1955. Dep: 11/01/1955.    
23/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/04/1959. Dep: 23/04/1959.    
04/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63847 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev