Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 670 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2009 Week
» 31507 Month
» 368353 Year
» 1589918 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2048 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6615   11/02/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3849   14/12/1946
British Railways 63849 w/e 06/11/1948
War Dept. 041   22/02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22141
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 11/02/1928
Withdrawal Fri 22/02/1952 off Colwick (38A)
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 041 and sent to Egypt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1919
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/02/1928
HLS Hull Springhead on 18/11/1929
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/07/1933
CUD Cudworth on 02/08/1937
HLS Hull Springhead on 29/04/1938
WHL West Hartlepool on 08/05/1940
HLS Hull Springhead on 05/01/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
CUD Cudworth on 16/10/1949
20C Royston on 12/08/1951
38A Colwick on 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn on 22/02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC CUD Cudworth w/e 22/10/1949
LOAN 20C Royston w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 20C Royston on 12/08/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/09/1951
OFFSTOCK UNK   on 22/02/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1268)
08/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1244)
18/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3227)
04/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3332)
13/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3235)
01/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3351)
31/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1280)
14/12/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3271)
06/11/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3251)
16/02/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22242)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/10/1927 11/02/1928 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6615
 
Darlington Works 18/08/1930 14/10/1930 58 days General  
Gorton Works 24/06/1933 08/07/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1935 18/01/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1938 04/06/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1940 13/04/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1943 01/05/1943 12 days General
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1945 31/03/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1946 14/12/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3849
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1948 06/11/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1952 16/02/1952 22 days General
Converted to oil fuel
Boiler number 22242 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2048
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22141
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
29/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6615
   
11/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/02/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
18/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1930. Dep: 14/10/1930.    
24/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15)
   
11/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
21/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 15)
   
02/08/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
29/04/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
   
06/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
   
08/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
20/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
   
05/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
10/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3849
   
16/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15)
   
06/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63849    
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
16/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
12/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
26/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Converted to oil fuel
Boiler number 22242 (Diagram 15)
   
22/02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 041 from Colwick (38A)    
22/02/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 041    

prev prev