Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 141 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1181 Week
» 11351 Month
» 289147 Year
» 1173528 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2052 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2849 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6294   15/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3850   08/12/1946
BR 63850 w/e 01/07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/822/10/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22143
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 15/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 20/06/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 46 yrs , 20 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 8/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 21/03/1924
DON Doncaster 24/03/1924
STV Staveley (G.C.) 05/11/1937
SHF Sheffield Darnall 06/02/1949
41F Mexborough 16/06/1963
41J Langwith Junction 22/12/1963
   Withdrawn 20/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 9w/e 08/02/1964
WDN   w/e 20/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 487)
20/01/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1429)
13/02/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1170)
02/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1220)
03/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1035)
23/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1008)
22/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1318)
05/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3429)
07/07/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1344)
18/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3396)
24/06/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3250)
22/11/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22106)
22/10/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28307)
08/11/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28339)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/07/1924 15/03/1924 -113 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 29/04/1925 18/05/1925 20 days General  
Gorton Works 22/09/1927 18/11/1927 58 days General  
Gorton Works 02/12/1929 20/01/1930 50 days General
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1931 13/02/1932 47 days General
Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1934 02/06/1934 43 days General
Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1936 03/10/1936 35 days General
Boiler number 1035 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1938 23/12/1938 34 days General
Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1941 22/03/1941 28 days General
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 28/03/1943 05/06/1943 70 days General
Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1945 07/07/1945 48 days General
Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/09/1946 12/10/1946 31 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 05/10/1947 18/11/1947 45 days General
Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1950 24/06/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63850
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1952 22/11/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1955 22/10/1955 75 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5039 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1958 08/11/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1962 28/09/1962 46 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2052
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22143
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2849    
08/1921 Allocation      
15/03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6294    
15/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/07/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924.    
29/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1925. Dep: 18/05/1925.    
22/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1927. Dep: 18/11/1927.    
02/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1929. Dep: 20/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15)
   
29/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1931. Dep: 13/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15)
   
21/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1934. Dep: 02/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1220 (Diagram 15)
   
30/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1035 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
20/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1938. Dep: 23/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1008 (Diagram 15)
   
23/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15)
   
21/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15)
   
12/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946.    
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3850    
05/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1947. Dep: 18/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
30/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63850
   
30/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15)
   
09/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5039 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1958. Dep: 08/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28339 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/08/1962. Dep: 28/09/1962.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
22/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
20/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63850 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev