Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 144 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6533 Week
» 26975 Month
» 363821 Year
» 1585386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2053 m/e 06/1919
London and North Western Railway 2854 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6299   08/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3851   10/11/1946
British Railways 63851 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/504/11/1939
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22144
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 08/03/1924
Withdrawal Thu 16/04/1959 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 39 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1919
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton on 15/03/1924
DON Doncaster on 24/03/1924
ANN Annesley on 14/03/1929
WFD Woodford Halse on 11/08/1944
ANN Annesley on 06/01/1946
CLK Colwick on 08/01/1948
ANN Annesley on 26/12/1948
CLK Colwick on 08/01/1950
38B Annesley on 08/10/1950
38A Colwick on 28/09/1952
36B Mexborough on 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn on 16/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 01/01/1949
ALLOC CLX   w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   on 16/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 486)
09/03/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1279)
13/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1366)
04/11/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1193)
21/12/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
21/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1147)
07/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1342)
04/11/1939 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3655)
12/02/1944 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3654)
01/06/1946 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 615)
18/12/1948 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3651)
29/07/1950 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 622)
05/03/1955 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 22342)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/01/1924 08/03/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6299
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1926 04/09/1926 71 days General  
Gorton Works 01/12/1928 09/03/1929 99 days General
Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1931 13/06/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1933 04/11/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1193 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1935 21/12/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1937 07/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1939 04/11/1939 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 3655 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1941 08/11/1941 33 days General  
Gorton Works 11/01/1944 12/02/1944 33 days General
Boiler number 3654 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1946 01/06/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1946 03/08/1946 1 day Light Repair
Wash-out plug
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1948 18/12/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to BR 63851
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1950 29/07/1950 29 days General
Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1951 27/10/1951 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 15/11/1952 13/12/1952 29 days General  
Gorton Works 22/12/1952 24/12/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/02/1955 05/03/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22342 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1955 10/03/1955 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/04/1959 11/04/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2053
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22144
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2854    
08/1921 Allocation      
12/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6299
   
08/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926.    
01/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 09/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15)
   
14/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
16/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1193 (Diagram 15)
   
14/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
24/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15)
   
30/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 3655 (Diagram 15A)
   
07/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1941. Dep: 08/11/1941.    
11/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3654 (Diagram 15A)
   
11/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
06/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
04/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15A)
   
03/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Wash-out plug
   
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3851    
08/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
Renumbered to BR 63851
   
26/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1950. Dep: 29/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22343 (Diagram 15A)
   
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
06/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1951. Dep: 27/10/1951.    
28/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
15/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952.    
22/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1952. Dep: 24/12/1952.    
05/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22342 (Diagram 15A)
   
08/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1955. Dep: 10/03/1955.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
11/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 11/04/1959. Dep: 11/04/1959.    
16/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63851 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev