Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2054 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2855 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6289   29/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3852   16/11/1946
BR (Tmp) E3852   14/02/1948
BR 63852 w/e 01/07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/805/11/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22145
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 29/03/1924
Withdrawal Thu 30/01/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 4/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 04/04/1924
DON Doncaster 07/04/1924
LIN Lincoln 19/01/1929
TUX Tuxford 02/02/1929
37A Ardsley 27/09/1953
39B Sheffield Darnall 20/12/1953
41F Mexborough 09/09/1962
41A Sheffield Darnall 09/12/1962
41H Staveley (G.C.) 10/02/1963
   Withdrawn 30/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 02/03/1963
WDN   30/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1160)
17/01/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1871)
31/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1140)
15/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1071)
30/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 514)
02/04/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
02/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3321)
13/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1010)
31/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3329)
01/09/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3331)
14/02/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3410)
24/06/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3432)
20/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22886)
05/11/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28884)
15/01/1959 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 28887)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1924 29/03/1924   Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6289
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1926 01/09/1926 72 days General  
Gorton Works 01/10/1928 17/01/1929 109 days General
Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1931 31/03/1931 70 days General
Boiler number 1140 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1933 15/07/1933 45 days General
Boiler number 1071 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1935 30/11/1935 35 days General
Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1938 02/04/1938 30 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1940 13/07/1940 27 days General
Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 23/08/1942 31/10/1942 70 days General
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1945 01/09/1945 70 days General
Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1948 14/02/1948 34 days General
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3852
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1950 24/06/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63852
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1952 20/12/1952 28 days General
Boiler number 22886 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1952 29/12/1952 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/08/1955 05/11/1955 93 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28884 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1958 15/01/1959 39 days General
Boiler number 28887 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2054
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22145
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2855    
08/1921 Allocation      
1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6289
   
29/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
04/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1926. Dep: 01/09/1926.    
01/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1928. Dep: 17/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1871 (Diagram 15)
   
19/01/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
02/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
21/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1931. Dep: 31/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1140 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1071 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
17/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
   
23/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
   
24/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15)
   
16/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3852    
12/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3852
   
30/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63852
   
23/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22886 (Diagram 15)
   
23/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/12/1952. Dep: 29/12/1952.    
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
20/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
05/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28884 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1958. Dep: 15/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28887 (Diagram 15)
   
09/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
10/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
30/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63852 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev