Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 632 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3277 Week
» 5859 Month
» 270492 Year
» 1492057 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2055 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2851 m/e 09/1919
GCR 1292c   02/01/1924
LNER (1924) 6292   28/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3853   11/08/1946
BR 63853 w/e 29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/827/05/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22146
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 02/01/1924
Withdrawal Tue 26/11/1963 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1919
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 02/01/1924
19D Heaton Mersey 26/10/1940
GOR Gorton 04/12/1940
ANN Annesley 03/12/1944
WFD Woodford Halse 29/06/1947
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
36C Frodingham 13/06/1954
41J Langwith Junction 18/01/1959
   Withdrawn 26/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 24/01/1959
WDN   26/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1140)
28/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1483)
22/10/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1145)
15/09/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1473)
24/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1126)
01/02/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
01/02/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3231)
01/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
16/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3256)
17/08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 811)
15/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1181)
27/05/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5015)
23/11/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5028)
29/01/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5023)
21/10/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28268)
02/01/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28389)
14/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28385)
30/11/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28395)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 02/01/1924 12 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1292c
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1924 28/08/1924 74 days General
Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6292
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1927 13/06/1927 48 days General  
Gorton Works 12/08/1929 22/10/1929 72 days General
Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1931 15/09/1931 27 days General
Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1934 24/02/1934 27 days General
Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1935 01/02/1936 43 days General
Boiler number 3231 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1938 16/07/1938 49 days General
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1940 17/08/1940 10 days General
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1942 15/08/1942 33 days General
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1942 04/09/1942 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/09/1942 14/09/1942 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/04/1944 27/05/1944 44 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1945 03/11/1945 16 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 15/09/1946 23/11/1946 70 days General
Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1948 29/01/1949 42 days General
Boiler number 5023 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63853
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1950 21/10/1950 46 days General
Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1952 02/01/1953 36 days General
Boiler number 28389 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1955 14/04/1955 35 days General
Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1957 30/11/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1959 20/02/1959 24 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/05/1959 03/06/1959 10 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/12/1959 05/02/1960 38 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2055
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22146
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2851    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 02/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1292c
   
02/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
16/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1924. Dep: 28/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6292
   
27/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1927. Dep: 13/06/1927.    
12/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1929. Dep: 22/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15)
   
20/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1931. Dep: 15/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15)
   
29/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15)
   
21/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 01/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3231 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
29/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15)
   
08/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
04/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 04/09/1942.    
06/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1942. Dep: 14/09/1942.    
14/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945.    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3853    
15/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1948. Dep: 29/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5023 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63853
   
06/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
28/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28389 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
11/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
28/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1959. Dep: 20/02/1959.    
25/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959.    
30/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/12/1959. Dep: 05/02/1960.    
26/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63853 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev