Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 624 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3310 Week
» 4200 Month
» 312181 Year
» 1196562 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2056 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2850 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6526   16/01/1926
LNER (1946) 3854   12/12/1946
BR 63854 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O107/06/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22147
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 16/01/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 12/01/1926
LNG Langwith Junction 16/01/1926
MEX Mexborough 07/05/1930
CLK Colwick 18/09/1944
GOR Gorton 16/06/1946
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1073)
19/04/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1302)
12/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1955)
11/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1237)
09/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3322)
29/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3217)
30/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3316)
07/06/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5057)
30/06/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5047)
10/02/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28290)
22/11/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28286)
03/03/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28384)
15/12/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28351)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/11/1925 16/01/1926 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6526
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1928 21/04/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 29/03/1930 19/04/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1932 12/11/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1935 11/05/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1938 09/04/1938 15 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3322 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1941 29/03/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1943 30/10/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1946 07/06/1946 91 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5057 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1948 30/06/1948 32 days General
Boiler number 5047 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63854
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1950 28/04/1950 61 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/01/1951 10/02/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1952 22/11/1952 23 days General
Boiler number 5040 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1954 10/07/1954 41 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 26/01/1955 03/03/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1956 15/12/1956 36 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1957 28/09/1957 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 02/06/1958 12/07/1958 41 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 20/05/1961 30/06/1961 42 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2056
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22147
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2850    
08/1921 Allocation      
14/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1925. Dep: 16/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6526
   
12/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
16/01/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
17/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928.    
29/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1302 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
   
26/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3322 (Diagram 15)
   
15/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
   
20/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram 15)
   
18/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5057 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3854    
30/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1948. Dep: 30/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5047 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63854
   
27/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1950. Dep: 28/04/1950.    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
10/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1952. Dep: 22/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5040 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954.    
26/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1955. Dep: 03/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957.    
02/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1958. Dep: 12/07/1958.    
20/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1961. Dep: 30/06/1961.    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63854 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev