Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 147 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6536 Week
» 26978 Month
» 363824 Year
» 1585389 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2059 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6616   29/10/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3855   30/12/1946
British Railways 63855 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22150
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 29/10/1927
Withdrawal Tue 31/03/1959 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 39 yrs , 10 mths
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1919
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 29/10/1927
HLS Hull Springhead on 24/03/1930
WHL West Hartlepool on 10/05/1940
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 05/10/1944
WHL West Hartlepool on 18/10/1944
HLS Hull Springhead on 10/01/1945
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 29/09/1946
36A Doncaster on 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn on 31/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 36A Doncaster on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 08/09/1951
WDN   on 31/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1234)
29/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1027)
22/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1033)
03/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1106)
20/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1082)
28/02/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 862)
18/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3291)
22/06/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
04/09/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3351)
02/06/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22190)
27/04/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22163)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/07/1927 29/10/1927 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6616
 
Darlington Works 12/06/1930 15/09/1930 96 days General  
Gorton Works 22/04/1933 29/04/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1935 22/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1937 03/07/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1940 20/04/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1942 28/02/1942 20 days General
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1944 18/03/1944 20 days General
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1946 22/06/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1948 04/09/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63855
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1951 02/06/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22190 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1953 21/03/1953 8 days Light Casual
Tender changed
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1953 26/03/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/10/1953 31/10/1953 15 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 03/11/1953 10/11/1953 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/10/1956 10/11/1956 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 13/11/1956 14/11/1956 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/04/1957 27/04/1957 22 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1959 23/03/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2059
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22150
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6616
   
29/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
29/10/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
24/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
12/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1930. Dep: 15/09/1930.    
22/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1935. Dep: 22/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15)
   
13/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
   
10/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
09/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
   
28/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
18/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
10/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
01/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
30/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3855    
14/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63855
   
12/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22190 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
14/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender changed
   
24/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 26/03/1953.    
17/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.    
03/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 10/11/1953.    
27/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956.    
13/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956.    
06/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/04/1957. Dep: 27/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 23/03/1959.    
31/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63855 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev