Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 748 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1788 Week
» 11958 Month
» 289754 Year
» 1174135 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2062 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2835 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6617   05/05/1928
LNER (1946) 3856   01/12/1946
BR (Tmp) E3856   14/02/1948
BR 63856 w/e 22/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O122/10/1949
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22153
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 05/05/1928
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 5/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
YK York (North) 05/05/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 06/02/1930
YK York (North) 02/10/1940
HTN Heaton 28/03/1943
TDK Tyne Dock 23/07/1945
HTN Heaton 22/07/1946
TDK Tyne Dock 08/09/1946
HLD Hull Dairycoates 22/10/1949
53C Hull Springhead 05/02/1950
53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
54B Tyne Dock 02/09/1951
   Withdrawn 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 21/05/1950
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 02/09/1951
WDN   26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 868)
06/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1016)
22/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1207)
17/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1231)
19/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3223)
01/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3216)
24/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3226)
09/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1206)
23/03/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3241)
22/10/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5120)
08/09/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28343)
17/05/1952 Westinghouse Brake fitted
17/05/1952 Vacuum Ejector fitted
30/01/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28335)
01/12/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28856)
01/02/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28321)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/03/1928 05/05/1928 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6617
 
Darlington Works 27/10/1930 05/12/1930 40 days General  
Gorton Works 30/07/1932 06/08/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1934 22/09/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1936 17/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1938 19/03/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1940 01/06/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1942 24/10/1942 19 days General
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1943 09/10/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1946 23/03/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1948 14/02/1948 8 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3856
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1949 22/10/1949 120 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5120 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63856
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1951 08/09/1951 30 days General
Boiler number 28343 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1952 17/05/1952 30 days Light Casual
Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic
Vacuum Ejector fitted
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1953 30/01/1954 39 days General
Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1954 22/01/1955 58 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 19/04/1956 26/05/1956 38 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/10/1956 01/12/1956 52 days General
Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1959 01/02/1960 68 days General
Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1960 17/12/1960 32 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 12/09/1961 21/10/1961 40 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2062
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22153
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2835    
08/1921 Allocation      
03/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6617
   
05/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
05/05/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
06/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
27/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1930. Dep: 05/12/1930.    
30/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 06/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
   
15/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
   
05/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
   
18/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
   
02/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
06/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
25/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
02/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3856    
07/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3856
   
25/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5120 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63856
   
22/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
10/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28343 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
18/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic
Vacuum Ejector fitted
   
23/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955.    
19/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 26/05/1956.    
11/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1959. Dep: 01/02/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960.    
12/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 21/10/1961.    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63856 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev