|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/11/1927 | 10/03/1928 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6618 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1930 | 05/12/1930 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1932 | 24/05/1932 | 1 day | No repairs | Sent to Gorton |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1932 | 23/07/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1934 | 03/11/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1936 | 27/06/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1938 | 29/10/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1941 | 14/06/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 24 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3692 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1947 | 17/05/1947 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1949 | 18/06/1949 | 29 days | General | After collision Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63857 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1952 | 15/03/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22329 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1954 | 06/11/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1958 | 02/08/1958 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1960 | 19/11/1960 | 50 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2063 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22154 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
26/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1927. Dep: 10/03/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6618 |
||
10/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/03/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
20/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1930. Dep: 05/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/05/1932. Dep: 24/05/1932. Work undertaken: Sent to Gorton |
||
18/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 23/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1934. Dep: 03/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
31/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3692 (Diagram 15D) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
22/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
04/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3857 | ||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
26/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1947. Dep: 17/05/1947. | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
21/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1949. Dep: 18/06/1949. Work undertaken: After collision Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63857 |
||
12/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) | ||
12/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (20C) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1952. Dep: 15/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22329 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
02/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D) |
||
31/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
01/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960. | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
08/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63857 from Ardsley (56B) |