Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 653 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4784 Week
» 14954 Month
» 292750 Year
» 1177131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2065 m/e 07/1919
LNER (1924) 6620   11/11/1927
LNER (1946) 3859   01/09/1946
BR 63859 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22156
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 11/11/1927
Withdrawal Fri 18/10/1963 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 44 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierly Hill, 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 11/11/1927
MEX Mexborough 25/11/1927
ANN Annesley 23/02/1929
STV Staveley (G.C.) 16/06/1949
38B Annesley 17/09/1950
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
38A Colwick 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn 18/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 17/09/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   18/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1214)
08/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1325)
13/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1057)
27/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1959)
05/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1013)
27/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1377)
10/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3355)
22/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1940)
11/01/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 933)
09/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3321)
07/05/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1136)
05/05/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22185)
04/10/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22104)
24/09/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22115)
17/10/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22142)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/10/1927 11/11/1927 21 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6620
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1930 08/07/1930 58 days General
Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1933 13/04/1933 54 days General
Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1935 27/07/1935 44 days General
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1937 05/06/1937 18 days General
Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1939 27/05/1939 37 days General
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1941 10/05/1941 41 days General
Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1943 22/05/1943 13 days General
Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1944 11/01/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1946 09/11/1946 62 days General
Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1949 07/05/1949 33 days General
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63859
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1951 03/02/1951 27 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 03/04/1951 05/05/1951 33 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1952 08/05/1952 4 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 13/09/1952 04/10/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1953 31/10/1953 40 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 03/11/1953 06/11/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 09/08/1955 24/09/1955 47 days General
Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1956 23/03/1956 65 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 19/04/1958 21/06/1958 64 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 15/09/1960 17/10/1960 33 days General
Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2065
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22156
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 11/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6620
   
11/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
11/11/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
25/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
23/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
12/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1930. Dep: 08/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15)
   
19/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1933. Dep: 13/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15)
   
14/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15)
   
21/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15)
   
31/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
   
10/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
   
07/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1944. Dep: 11/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3859    
09/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63859
   
16/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
17/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951.    
03/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15)
   
05/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952.    
13/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.    
03/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 06/11/1953.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
09/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15)
   
19/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1956. Dep: 23/03/1956.    
19/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1958. Dep: 21/06/1958.    
15/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1960. Dep: 17/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63859 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev