|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/08/1927 | 19/10/1927 | 54 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6622 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1929 | 18/07/1929 | 42 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1931 | 04/06/1931 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/07/1933 | 02/09/1933 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1936 | 21/03/1936 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1938 | 14/04/1938 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1940 | 26/10/1940 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1942 | 02/01/1943 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1945 | 26/01/1946 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1948 | 04/05/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63861 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1950 | 26/08/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1950 | 13/09/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1952 | 29/11/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1954 | 18/12/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 22281 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 43 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28938 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1958 | 16/08/1958 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1960 | 26/10/1960 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2068 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22159 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
27/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 19/10/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6622 |
||
19/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
19/10/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
07/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1929. Dep: 18/07/1929. | ||
21/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
04/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1931. Dep: 04/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
13/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1938. Dep: 14/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3861 | ||
31/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1948. Dep: 04/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63861 |
||
01/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1950. Dep: 13/09/1950. | ||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
08/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22281 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28938 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1958. Dep: 16/08/1958. | ||
20/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/09/1960. Dep: 26/10/1960. | ||
21/02/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63861 from Langwith Junction (41J) |