Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 750 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1790 Week
» 11960 Month
» 289756 Year
» 1174137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2068 m/e 07/1919
LNER (1924) 6622   19/10/1927
LNER (1946) 3861   07/09/1946
BR 63861 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1919
O4/809/11/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22159
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 19/10/1927
Withdrawal Sun 21/02/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 45 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Parkgate, 4/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 19/10/1927
TUX Tuxford 21/01/1930
40E Langwith Junction 27/09/1953
   Withdrawn 21/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   w/e 21/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1242)
04/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1943)
02/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 515)
21/03/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
21/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3235)
21/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
14/04/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3326)
26/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1858)
02/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3338)
26/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3429)
04/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3330)
26/08/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1070)
29/11/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22133)
18/12/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22281)
09/11/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28938)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/08/1927 19/10/1927 54 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6622
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1929 18/07/1929 42 days General  
Gorton Works 04/04/1931 04/06/1931 62 days General
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1933 02/09/1933 48 days General
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1936 21/03/1936 14 days General
Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1938 14/04/1938 33 days General
Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1940 26/10/1940 28 days General
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1942 02/01/1943 65 days General
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1945 26/01/1946 58 days General
Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1948 04/05/1948 35 days General
Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63861
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1950 26/08/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/09/1950 13/09/1950 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/11/1952 29/11/1952 27 days General
Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1954 18/12/1954 41 days General
Boiler number 22281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1957 09/11/1957 43 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28938 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1958 16/08/1958 15 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/09/1960 26/10/1960 37 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2068
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22159
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
27/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 19/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6622
   
19/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
19/10/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1929. Dep: 18/07/1929.    
21/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
04/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1931. Dep: 04/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
   
17/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
   
08/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
13/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1938. Dep: 14/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
   
30/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3861    
31/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1948. Dep: 04/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63861
   
01/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
   
09/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1950. Dep: 13/09/1950.    
03/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
08/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22281 (Diagram 15)
   
28/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28938 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1958. Dep: 16/08/1958.    
20/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/09/1960. Dep: 26/10/1960.    
21/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63861 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev