Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 464 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 464 Week
» 17800 Month
» 295596 Year
» 1179977 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2073 m/e 08/1919
LNER (1924) 6532   13/03/1926
LNER (1946) 3862   08/09/1946
BR 63862 w/e 12/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1919
O4/806/07/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22164
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 13/03/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 18/06/1925
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 18/03/1926
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) m/e 1928
MAR March 02/03/1929
CLK Colwick 12/01/1934
ANN Annesley 22/02/1935
39A Gorton 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 02/07/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1106)
31/05/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1381)
16/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1298)
13/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 486)
08/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3257)
08/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
12/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1049)
10/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3237)
18/08/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3263)
26/04/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3306)
12/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1182)
07/06/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22147)
09/10/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22246)
06/07/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28366)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/01/1926 13/03/1926 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6532
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1928 04/08/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 03/05/1930 31/05/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1932 16/04/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1934 13/10/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1936 08/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1938 22/10/1938 29 days General  
Gorton Works 05/10/1940 12/10/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1943 10/04/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1945 18/08/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1947 26/04/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1949 12/03/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63862
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1949 24/09/1949 80 days Light Repair
Collision damage
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1950 25/03/1950 43 days General  
Gorton Works 17/05/1952 07/06/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1954 09/10/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22246 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1957 06/07/1957 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28366 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1960 13/08/1960 57 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 27/08/1960 27/08/1960 1 day Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2073
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22164
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
18/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1926. Dep: 13/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6532
   
13/03/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
1928 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
30/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 04/08/1928.    
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
03/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15)
   
12/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 486 (Diagram 15)
   
22/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
24/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938.    
05/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
   
24/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3862    
05/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
   
19/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1949. Dep: 12/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63862
   
07/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Collision damage
   
11/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1950. Dep: 25/03/1950.    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
17/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1952. Dep: 07/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
   
18/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22246 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28366 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/06/1960. Dep: 13/08/1960.    
27/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/08/1960. Dep: 27/08/1960.    
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63862 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev