Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 350 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 350 Week
» 17686 Month
» 295482 Year
» 1179863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2075 m/e 08/1919
LNER (1924) 6534   08/08/1925
LNER (1946) 3864   19/07/1946
BR 63864 w/e 16/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1919
O4/821/09/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22166
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 08/08/1925
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs , 8 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 18/8/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 06/08/1925
DON Doncaster 17/08/1925
FRO Frodingham 03/03/1939
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
39A Gorton 21/05/1950
37A Ardsley 22/09/1952
56A Wakefield 22/02/1959
56B Ardsley 11/06/1961
   Withdrawn 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1290)
01/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1087)
12/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1053)
09/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1265)
09/06/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
18/07/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1101)
08/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1007)
15/02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3345)
23/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3210)
09/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3392)
16/04/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3288)
28/07/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22202)
06/03/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22160)
21/09/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28846)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/05/1925 08/08/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6534
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1927 11/02/1928 71 days General  
Gorton Works 08/02/1930 01/03/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1087 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1931 12/12/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1934 09/06/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1936 18/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1938 08/10/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1941 15/02/1941 8 days General
Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1943 23/10/1943 13 days General
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1946 09/11/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1949 16/04/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63864
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1951 28/07/1951 36 days General
Boiler number 22202 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1954 06/03/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 22160 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1954 16/03/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 10/08/1957 21/09/1957 43 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28846 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 07/05/1962 07/05/1962 1 day Weighing  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2075
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22166
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 08/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6534
   
06/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/08/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
17/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928.    
08/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1087 (Diagram 15)
   
28/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1265 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
04/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1101 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
17/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15)
   
03/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
08/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
   
11/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3864    
26/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
   
26/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1949. Dep: 16/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63864
   
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
23/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1951. Dep: 28/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22202 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
13/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22160 (Diagram 15)
   
09/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 16/03/1954.    
10/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28846 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
07/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/05/1962. Dep: 07/05/1962.    
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63864 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev