|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/05/1925 | 08/08/1925 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6535 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1927 | 21/01/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1930 | 19/07/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1151 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1932 | 23/07/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1933 | 16/09/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1935 | 06/07/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1966 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 15 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1943 | 24/04/1943 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1945 | 09/02/1946 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5049 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 1946 | Unclassified | Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1948 | 23/02/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 5044 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3865 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1950 | 10/08/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63865 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1950 | 13/01/1951 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1952 | 13/09/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1955 | 28/01/1956 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1956 | 14/12/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1959 | 10/04/1959 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
14/08/1963 | Crewe Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2076 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22167 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 08/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6535 |
||
04/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/08/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
14/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
10/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 21/01/1928. | ||
28/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1930. Dep: 19/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1151 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 23/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/02/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
26/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1966 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
15/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
29/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. | ||
27/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 09/02/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5049 (Diagram 100A) |
||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/1946. Work undertaken: Drop Grate fitted |
||
17/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3865 | ||
17/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 23/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5044 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3865 |
||
23/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
29/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
14/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
15/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1950. Dep: 10/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63865 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
09/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951. | ||
18/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1952. Dep: 13/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. | ||
04/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/12/1955. Dep: 28/01/1956. | ||
12/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 14/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/03/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959. | ||
19/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63865 from Doncaster (36A) |