|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/02/1927 | 02/04/1927 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6623 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1932 | 23/07/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1934 | 12/01/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1937 | 23/01/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1939 | 29/04/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1941 | 23/08/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3378 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2078 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22169 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 02/04/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6623 |
||
06/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
06/04/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
26/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. | ||
09/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 23/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 12/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
16/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 23/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3378 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 716 from Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
13/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 716 |