Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 113 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1038 Week
» 18374 Month
» 296170 Year
» 1180551 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2081 m/e 08/1919
LNER (1924) 6625   16/04/1927
LNER (1946) 3868   07/04/1946
BR 63868 w/e 26/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1919
O124/02/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22172
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 19/04/1927
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Mon 01/11/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull. 8/65 Cut up 1/11/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 19/04/1927
DON Doncaster 13/11/1931
GOR Gorton 04/12/1931
WFD Woodford Halse 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 02/07/1950
31B March 17/02/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 24/02/1963
41J Langwith Junction 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1004)
19/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1758)
17/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1458)
14/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1967)
14/12/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
04/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1041)
08/02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 815)
06/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1041)
24/02/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5026)
17/05/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5012)
26/11/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5039)
31/05/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28829)
01/05/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28851)
28/04/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28332)
15/03/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28297)
14/10/1961 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
29/03/1963 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28527)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/02/1927 16/04/1927 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6625
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1929 14/09/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 28/11/1931 19/12/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1758 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1934 17/03/1934 15 days General
Spring gear altered for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1935 14/12/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1938 04/06/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1939 29/07/1939 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/02/1941 08/02/1941 8 days General
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/12/1941 17/01/1942 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/02/1943 06/03/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1944 29/07/1944 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 09/12/1944 24/02/1945 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1947 17/05/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1949 26/11/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 5039 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63868
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1951 21/04/1951 29 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 17/05/1952 31/05/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1953 30/05/1953 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 03/04/1954 01/05/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 28851 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1955 25/06/1955 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 24/03/1956 28/04/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1958 15/03/1958 22 days General
Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1961 14/10/1961 43 days HfI
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 25/02/1963 29/03/1963 33 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2081
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22172
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6625
   
19/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/04/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 14/09/1929.    
13/11/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1758 (Diagram 15)
   
04/12/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Spring gear altered for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 1458 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939.    
01/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 815 (Diagram 15)
   
27/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/12/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942.    
17/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944.    
09/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1944. Dep: 24/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5026 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3868    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1947. Dep: 17/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5012 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5039 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63868
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
24/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951.    
17/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953.    
03/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28851 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955.    
24/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1956. Dep: 28/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28332 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/09/1961 Works Visit      
24/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
25/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1963. Dep: 29/03/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63868 from Langwith Junction (41J)    
01/11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev