Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 624 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3310 Week
» 4200 Month
» 312181 Year
» 1196562 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2082 m/e 08/1919
LNER (1924) 6626   18/06/1927
LNER (1946) 3869   06/04/1946
BR 63869 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1919
O102/12/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22173
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 16/06/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 43 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WFD Woodford Halse 16/06/1927
DON Doncaster 24/09/1928
MEX Mexborough 01/10/1928
WFD Woodford Halse 19/11/1928
CLK Colwick 13/10/1940
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
GOR Gorton 10/12/1944
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 02/07/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1078)
25/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1365)
30/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1136)
31/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 931)
31/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
31/10/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
28/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1464)
11/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 865)
08/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3401)
02/12/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5013)
08/02/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5010)
22/10/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5081)
05/01/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28369)
14/11/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28359)
06/08/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28290)
12/04/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28325)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/03/1927 18/06/1927 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6626
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1929 14/12/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 11/06/1932 25/06/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1934 30/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/10/1936 31/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1939 28/01/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1940 11/05/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1942 08/08/1942 10 days General
Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1944 02/12/1944 67 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1946 08/02/1947 49 days General
Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1947 20/06/1947 55 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/05/1948 08/06/1948 11 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63869
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1949 22/10/1949 27 days General
Boiler number 5081 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1951 05/01/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1953 19/02/1953 31 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/10/1953 14/11/1953 17 days General
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1955 03/03/1955 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/06/1955 06/08/1955 40 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1956 16/03/1956 37 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 12/03/1958 12/04/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 28325 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1958 20/12/1958 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/08/1961 23/09/1961 36 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2082
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22173
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 18/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6626
   
16/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
16/06/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
24/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
01/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
19/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
16/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929.    
11/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15)
   
16/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
14/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 28/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
   
27/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3869    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1946. Dep: 08/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1947. Dep: 20/06/1947.    
29/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1948. Dep: 08/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63869
   
26/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5081 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
29/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1951. Dep: 05/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1953. Dep: 19/02/1953.    
29/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1955. Dep: 03/03/1955.    
28/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/06/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1956. Dep: 16/03/1956.    
12/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28325 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958.    
19/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961.    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63869 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev