Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 773 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 773 Week
» 18109 Month
» 295905 Year
» 1180286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2084 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6627   21/05/1927
LNER (1946) 3870   28/07/1946
BR (Tmp) E3870   31/01/1948
BR 63870 w/e 31/03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22175
To Service During 09/1919
Taken into Stock 17/05/1927
Withdrawal Fri 26/01/1962 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 42 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 17/05/1927
LIV Brunswick 29/11/1935
GOR Gorton 14/11/1936
GRA Grantham 02/05/1937
MEX Mexborough 21/11/1942
DON Doncaster 27/08/1944
MEX Mexborough 25/08/1946
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn 26/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   26/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1018)
29/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1243)
07/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1011)
16/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1221)
16/11/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
14/11/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1340)
14/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1019)
17/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1254)
30/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3405)
31/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3415)
31/03/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22172)
30/05/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22136)
21/04/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22151)
01/11/1958 Water Treatment apparatus fitted
01/11/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22874)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/02/1927 21/05/1927 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6627
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1929 14/09/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 15/08/1931 29/08/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1933 07/10/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1011 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1935 16/11/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1936 14/11/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1939 14/10/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 01/09/1942 17/10/1942 47 days General
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1944 22/07/1944 4 days Light Repair
Tender only
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1945 30/06/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1948 31/01/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3870
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1951 31/03/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63870
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1951 15/09/1951 12 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 09/05/1953 30/05/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22136 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1953 13/06/1953 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/05/1954 12/06/1954 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/06/1954 16/06/1954 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/03/1956 21/04/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1956 30/04/1956 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/03/1958 29/03/1958 8 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1958 01/11/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1962 23/01/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2084
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22175
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6627
   
17/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/05/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
10/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 14/09/1929.    
15/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1011 (Diagram 15)
   
09/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
29/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
07/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
   
14/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
30/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
19/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/07/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
27/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
09/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3870    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 31/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3870
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
10/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63870
   
04/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1951. Dep: 15/09/1951.    
09/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22136 (Diagram 15)
   
03/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953.    
22/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954.    
10/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1954. Dep: 16/06/1954.    
17/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15)
   
28/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1956. Dep: 30/04/1956.    
22/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
04/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1958. Dep: 01/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15)
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
23/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/01/1962. Dep: 23/01/1962.    
26/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63870 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev