Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 339 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5976 Week
» 19080 Month
» 19080 Year
» 1240645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2087 m/e 10/1919
LNER (1924) 6628   30/04/1927
War Dept. 786   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22177
To Service During 10/1919
Taken into Stock 29/04/1927
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off Grantham (GRA)
Service Life 22 yrs , 18 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 786 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 29/04/1927
GRA Grantham 04/05/1937
   Withdrawn 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1001)
05/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1367)
05/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 821)
20/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
20/06/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
20/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3247)
11/03/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3264)
18/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3303)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/02/1927 30/04/1927 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6628
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1929 28/09/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 21/11/1931 05/12/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1934 05/05/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1936 20/06/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1939 11/03/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1941 18/10/1941 19 days General
Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 786
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2087
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22177
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6628
   
29/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/04/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
24/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 28/09/1929.    
21/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
   
21/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
   
06/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
04/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
25/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
   
30/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 786
   
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 786 from Grantham (GRA)    

prev prev