|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/02/1927 | 30/04/1927 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6628 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1929 | 28/09/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1934 | 05/05/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1936 | 20/06/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1941 | 18/10/1941 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 786 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2087 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22177 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6628 |
||
29/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/04/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
24/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 28/09/1929. | ||
21/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
04/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
25/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 786 |
||
18/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 786 from Grantham (GRA) |