Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1039 Week
» 18375 Month
» 296171 Year
» 1180552 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2094 m/e 05/1919
LNWR 2845 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6525   14/11/1925
LNER (1946) 3872   18/05/1946
BR 63872 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1919
O118/05/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22184
To Service During 05/1919
Taken into Stock 14/11/1925
Withdrawal Thu 30/01/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 44 yrs , 9 mths
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 4/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 10/11/1925
CLK Colwick 09/01/1926
LNG Langwith Junction 23/06/1930
STV Staveley (G.C.) 30/03/1932
FRO Frodingham 17/03/1939
GOR Gorton 26/05/1946
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
HSY Hornsey 02/07/1948
GOR Gorton 05/09/1948
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
31B March 26/05/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 24/11/1963
   Withdrawn 30/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 11/09/1948
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 25/11/1963
WDN   30/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1058)
13/02/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1052)
21/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1965)
21/07/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
01/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1134)
15/10/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
15/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1957)
01/02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3349)
18/05/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5056)
08/1946 Drop Grate fitted
17/04/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5045)
20/12/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28387)
04/12/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28329)
22/12/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28924)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/09/1925 14/11/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6525
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1928 01/12/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 23/01/1932 13/02/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1934 21/07/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1936 01/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1938 15/10/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1941 01/02/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1943 01/05/1943 24 days General  
Gorton Works 1946 08/1946   Unclassified
Boiler number 5056 (Diagram 100A)
Drop Grate fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3872
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1946 18/05/1946 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1948 17/04/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 5045 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63872
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1950 19/08/1950 15 days General  
Gorton Works 28/07/1951 18/08/1951 22 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 06/12/1952 20/12/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1954 04/12/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1955 09/04/1955 1 day Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/11/1956 22/12/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 28924 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1959 17/10/1959 29 days Light Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 01/02/1962 30/03/1962 58 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2094
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22184
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2845    
08/1921 Allocation      
05/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6525
   
10/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/11/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
09/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
27/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928.    
23/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
23/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1932. Dep: 13/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1052 (Diagram 15)
   
30/03/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
07/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
18/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
17/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
18/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15)
   
08/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943.    
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5056 (Diagram 100A)
Drop Grate fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3872
   
02/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
   
26/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1948. Dep: 17/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5045 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63872
   
02/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
05/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1950. Dep: 19/08/1950.    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
28/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951.    
06/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1954. Dep: 04/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28329 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1955. Dep: 09/04/1955.    
24/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28924 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
19/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1959. Dep: 17/10/1959.    
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
01/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1962. Dep: 30/03/1962.    
24/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
30/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63872 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev