Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 341 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5978 Week
» 19082 Month
» 19082 Year
» 1240647 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2095 m/e 05/1919
LNER (1924) 6629   24/11/1927
LNER (1946) 3873   30/06/1946
BR 63873 w/e 04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1919
O4/820/08/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22185
To Service During 05/1919
Taken into Stock 24/11/1927
Withdrawal Sat 15/01/1966 off Colwick (16B)
Scrapping Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 46 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to George Cohen, Kettering, 3/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 24/11/1927
TUX Tuxford 07/02/1934
IMM Immingham 07/05/1934
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 22/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 21/07/1942
STV Staveley (G.C.) 03/04/1944
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
38A Colwick 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn 15/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 15/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1215)
07/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 828)
07/04/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1481)
14/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1305)
07/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3385)
05/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3312)
16/09/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3214)
18/01/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3217)
04/12/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3299)
14/10/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22118)
01/11/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22875)
20/08/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28882)
05/10/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28338)
19/05/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28895)
27/02/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28303)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/10/1927 24/11/1927 34 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6629
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1929 28/12/1929 8 days General  
Gorton Works 16/07/1932 07/07/1932 -8 days General  
Gorton Works 04/04/1935 07/04/1935 4 days General
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1937 14/08/1937 16 days General
Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15)
 
Doncaster Works 17/07/1939 22/07/1939 6 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/02/1940 07/02/1940 -9 days General  
Gorton Works 29/07/1942 05/09/1942 39 days General
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1944 16/09/1944 31 days General
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1946 18/01/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1948 04/12/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63873
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1950 14/10/1950 31 days General
Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1952 01/11/1952 25 days General
Boiler number 22875 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1955 20/08/1955 66 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28882 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1957 05/10/1957 34 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1957 16/11/1957 16 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/04/1959 19/05/1959 28 days General
Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1962 27/02/1962 34 days General
Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2095
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22185
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 24/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6629
   
24/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/11/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 28/12/1929.    
07/07/1932 Modification Diagram 15 number 828 boiler fitted    
16/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1932. Dep: 07/07/1932.    
07/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
07/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
04/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1935. Dep: 07/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1481 (Diagram 15)
   
30/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1305 (Diagram 15)
   
17/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939.    
07/02/1940 Modification Diagram 15 number 3385 boiler fitted    
17/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 07/02/1940.    
22/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
21/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
29/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3312 (Diagram 15)
   
03/04/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
17/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
   
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3873    
07/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63873
   
14/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22118 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22875 (Diagram 15)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28882 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1957. Dep: 05/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957.    
22/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1959. Dep: 19/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1962. Dep: 27/02/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63873 from Colwick (16B)    

prev prev