Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 710 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1657 Week
» 20439 Month
» 268732 Year
» 1153113 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2098 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2856 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6527   05/12/1925
War Dept. 791   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22188
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 05/12/1925
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off March (MAR)
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 791 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 05/12/1925
LNG Langwith Junction m/e 1928
MAR March 02/03/1929
LIN Lincoln 14/08/1930
MAR March 27/09/1930
CAM Cambridge 25/10/1931
MAR March 05/12/1936
   Withdrawn 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1064)
17/03/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1089)
01/02/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1414)
25/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1342)
29/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1299)
02/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1297)
11/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 828)
18/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 861)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/09/1925 05/12/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6527
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1926 06/03/1926 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/02/1928 17/03/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1930 01/02/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1932 25/06/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1935 29/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1937 02/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 11/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1941 18/10/1941 16 days General
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 791
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2098
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22188
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2856    
08/1921 Allocation      
05/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6527
   
05/12/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/12/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
27/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1926. Dep: 06/03/1926.    
1928 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
04/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15)
   
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
11/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 01/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
   
14/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
27/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
25/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
11/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15)
   
15/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15)
   
05/12/1936 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
18/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 791
   
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 791 from March (MAR)    

prev prev