Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 350 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 350 Week
» 17686 Month
» 295482 Year
» 1179863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2099 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2857 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6528   05/12/1925
LNER (1946) 3876   17/08/1946
BR 63876 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/729/01/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22189
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 05/12/1925
Withdrawal Tue 10/03/1959 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 39 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 04/12/1925
CLK Colwick 09/01/1926
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
GOR Gorton 25/06/1945
LNG Langwith Junction 23/09/1945
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 30/03/1947
CLK Colwick 20/11/1949
39A Gorton 21/05/1950
38A Colwick 13/06/1954
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn 10/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 05/04/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   10/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1040)
21/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1030)
19/05/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
19/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 547)
19/05/1934 Eureka lubricator fitted
24/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
24/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1961)
20/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 872)
05/07/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1941)
29/01/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3691)
17/08/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3697)
27/11/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3681)
30/09/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22302)
18/10/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22339)
26/02/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22346)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/09/1925 05/12/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6528
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1928 22/12/1928 36 days General  
Gorton Works 07/11/1931 21/11/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1934 19/05/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1936 24/10/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1937 30/10/1937 15 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 06/05/1939 20/05/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1941 05/07/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1944 29/01/1944 27 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3691 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1946 17/08/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3876
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1948 27/11/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63876
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1950 30/09/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1952 18/10/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22339 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1953 13/06/1953 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/01/1955 26/02/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22346 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1955 18/03/1955 19 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 02/03/1959 02/03/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2099
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22189
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2857    
08/1921 Allocation      
05/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6528
   
04/12/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/12/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
09/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928.    
07/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15)
   
12/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
10/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
16/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937.    
06/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15)
   
16/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1944. Dep: 29/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3691 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
27/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3876
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
06/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63876
   
20/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
16/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D)
   
27/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22339 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1955. Dep: 26/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22346 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
02/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959.    
10/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63876 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev