Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 139 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3282 Week
» 13452 Month
» 291248 Year
» 1175629 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2101 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2853 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6529   06/03/1926
LNER (1946) 3877   02/06/1946
BR 63877 w/e 26/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/827/04/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22191
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 06/03/1926
Withdrawal Sun 21/03/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Arnott Young (Rawmarsh, Rotherham)
Service Life 45 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Rawmarsh, 5/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 02/03/1926
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 15/03/1926
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 17/02/1934
40E Langwith Junction 10/09/1950
39A Gorton 11/03/1951
39B Sheffield Darnall 08/04/1951
38A Colwick 09/06/1951
38D Staveley (G.C.) 22/01/1956
41F Mexborough 31/01/1960
41J Langwith Junction 01/03/1964
   Withdrawn 21/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 10/09/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 09/06/1951
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   w/e 21/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1103)
29/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1959)
04/02/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1184)
17/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1080)
17/08/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
18/09/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 518)
30/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1853)
29/11/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3250)
27/05/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3272)
12/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3304)
26/11/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3284)
08/03/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22246)
02/09/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22260)
27/04/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28930)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/01/1926 06/03/1926 48 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6529
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1928 09/10/1928 65 days General  
Gorton Works 02/06/1930 29/07/1930 58 days General
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1932 04/02/1933 48 days General
Boiler number 1184 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1935 17/08/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 1080 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1937 18/09/1937 23 days General
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1939 30/09/1939 56 days General
Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1941 29/11/1941 42 days General
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1944 27/05/1944 20 days General
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1947 24/08/1947 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 09/09/1947 12/10/1947 34 days General
Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1949 26/11/1949 25 days General
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63877
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1949 08/12/1949 10 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/02/1952 08/03/1952 35 days General
Boiler number 22246 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1954 02/09/1954 39 days General
Boiler number 22260 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1957 27/04/1957 55 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28930 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1961 12/08/1961 62 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2101
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22191
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2853    
08/1921 Allocation      
18/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1926. Dep: 06/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6529
   
02/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/03/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
06/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1928. Dep: 09/10/1928.    
02/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1930. Dep: 29/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15)
   
19/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1932. Dep: 04/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1184 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
13/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1080 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
27/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1937. Dep: 18/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
   
06/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15)
   
19/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
   
08/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
   
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3877    
22/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 24/08/1947.    
09/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1947. Dep: 12/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15)
   
02/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3284 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63877
   
29/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1949. Dep: 08/12/1949.    
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
11/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
09/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
03/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22246 (Diagram 15)
   
26/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1954. Dep: 02/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22260 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
22/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
04/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1957. Dep: 27/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28930 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
12/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/06/1961. Dep: 12/08/1961.    
01/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
21/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63877 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev