Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 178 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4346 Week
» 19460 Month
» 322650 Year
» 1544215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2104 m/e 06/1919
London and North Western Railway 2833 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6631   26/05/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3878   22/06/1946
British Railways 63878 w/e 13/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/807/09/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22194
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 26/05/1928
Withdrawal Sun 14/03/1965 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield)
Service Life 45 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Steel Breaking & Dismantling, Chesterfield, 5/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1919
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
YK York (North) on 26/05/1928
HLS Hull Springhead on 21/08/1930
WHL West Hartlepool on 07/05/1940
IMM Immingham on 11/06/1944
40E Colwick on 23/09/1962
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 30/12/1962
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 10/01/1965
   Withdrawn on 14/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 14/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1876)
28/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 861)
25/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 822)
09/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1680)
19/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 863)
03/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1314)
11/03/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1365)
09/05/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 949)
27/05/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1259)
09/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3383)
13/05/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3339)
06/09/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22292)
26/02/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22128)
07/09/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28935)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/05/1928 26/05/1928 22 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6631
 
Darlington Works 08/12/1930 28/01/1931 52 days General
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1933 25/03/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1934 25/07/1934 4 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 31/01/1935 09/02/1935 10 days General
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1936 19/12/1936 11 days General
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1938 03/08/1938 30 days General
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1940 11/03/1940 21 days General
Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1941 22/03/1941 31 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/04/1942 09/05/1942 27 days General
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1944 27/05/1944 21 days General
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1947 09/10/1947 44 days General
Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1950 13/05/1950 26 days General
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63878
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1950 22/05/1950 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/08/1951 08/09/1951 18 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/09/1951 12/09/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 13/08/1952 06/09/1952 25 days General
Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1955 26/02/1955 48 days General
Boiler number 22128 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1957 07/09/1957 62 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28935 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1958 20/12/1958 10 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/06/1959 10/07/1959 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/09/1961 04/11/1961 36 days Light Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/10/1963 Swindon Works (Dump) Triangle: 3653, 4507, 4690, 9645. Yard: D829/50/69, D1056, 3652/68, 3766/9, 4082, 4113/76, 5093, 6000/11/25/26, 6763 6819/58/61, 6922/23/61, 7803/08, 8738, 9412/40, 9633, 9700/99. 'A' Shop: D833/4/45/61, D1000/1/7/25/6/8/36/40/54/63/7, D3102, D3510/1/2/9, D3599/604/809, D7039, 4121/50/61, 6116, 6820/35, 6864/66/72/6, 6947/59/80, 7922, 9605, 9673. Dump: 1471, 1608, 4134, 4629/51, 5201, 5645, 5787, 6416, 6609/31/9/74, 8491, 8791, 9401, 9636, 9764. SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2104
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22194
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2833    
08/1921 Allocation      
05/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6631
   
26/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
26/05/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
08/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1930. Dep: 28/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
   
18/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1933. Dep: 25/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1934. Dep: 25/07/1934.    
31/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1935. Dep: 09/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
   
05/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1938. Dep: 03/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1314 (Diagram 15)
   
20/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1940. Dep: 11/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
20/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.    
13/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
   
11/06/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
22/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3878    
27/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 15)
   
18/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63878
   
17/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1950. Dep: 22/05/1950.    
22/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951.    
11/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1951. Dep: 12/09/1951.    
13/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15)
   
10/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1955. Dep: 26/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22128 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28935 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1958. Dep: 20/12/1958.    
19/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959.    
30/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1961. Dep: 04/11/1961.    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
14/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63878 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev