Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 625 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3311 Week
» 4201 Month
» 312182 Year
» 1196563 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2110 m/e 07/1919
LNER (1924) 6288   18/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3879   02/06/1946
BR 63879 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/207/1919
O104/11/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22200
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 18/07/1924
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)
Scrapping Mon 27/09/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 46 yrs , 11 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 8/65. Cut up 27/9/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
THJ Thornton Junction 18/07/1924
DFU Dunfermline Upper 29/07/1943
ANN Annesley 01/10/1943
GOR Gorton 03/12/1944
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 23/04/1950
31B March 10/02/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 24/11/1963
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 23/04/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 25/11/1963
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1468)
16/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1104)
20/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1476)
07/11/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 828)
04/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1024)
23/05/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3407)
04/11/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5010)
01/02/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5018)
08/01/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5055)
17/11/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28359)
17/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28328)
24/03/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28345)
24/01/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28828)
22/08/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28500)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/02/1924 18/07/1924 149 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6288
 
Cowlairs Works 1927 03/1927   General  
Cowlairs Works 1928 06/1928   General  
Cowlairs Works 1930 25/06/1930   General  
Gorton Works 02/07/1932 16/07/1932 15 days General
Larger chimney and Gresley snifting valve fitted
Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1934 20/10/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1476 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1936 07/11/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1939 04/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1942 23/05/1942 13 days General
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1944 04/11/1944 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1946 01/02/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 5018 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1948 08/01/1949 28 days General
Boiler number 5055 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63879
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1951 17/11/1951 29 days General
Tender ftted for Alfloc briquettes
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1953 17/10/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 28328 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1954 22/05/1954 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/12/1954 11/12/1954 1 day Light Casual  
Gorton Works 26/03/1955 14/05/1955 50 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/02/1956 24/03/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1956 15/09/1956 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 04/01/1958 01/02/1958 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 20/12/1958 24/01/1959 36 days General
Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 15/06/1962 22/08/1962 69 days General
Boiler number 28500 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2110
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22200
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 18/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6288
   
18/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
18/07/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1927. Dep: ?/03/1927.    
1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1928. Dep: ?/06/1928.    
1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1930. Dep: 25/06/1930.    
02/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Larger chimney and Gresley snifting valve fitted
Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1476 (Diagram 15)
   
31/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1936. Dep: 07/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
   
11/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
01/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
26/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5010 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3879    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5018 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5055 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63879
   
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
20/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender ftted for Alfloc briquettes
Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28328 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954.    
11/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954.    
26/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/03/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955.    
25/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1956. Dep: 24/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1956. Dep: 15/09/1956.    
10/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
04/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/01/1958. Dep: 01/02/1958.    
20/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1958. Dep: 24/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28828 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1962. Dep: 22/08/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28500 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63879 from Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
27/09/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev