Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2112 m/e 07/1919
LNER (1924) 6286   19/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3880   25/08/1946
BR 63880 w/e 15/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/207/1919
O4/718/03/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22202
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 19/08/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 17/03/1963 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 43 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 2/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 19/08/1924
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 12/03/1931
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 09/1931
IMM Immingham 22/07/1943
MAR March 07/09/1944
CAM Cambridge 22/12/1947
ARD Ardsley 18/12/1949
39A Gorton 11/06/1950
36C Frodingham 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 17/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC ARD Ardsley w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   17/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1467)
07/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1468)
13/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 870)
24/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1377)
05/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1249)
01/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1232)
18/03/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 5101)
22/02/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3664)
15/10/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3676)
30/08/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22338)
07/05/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22308)
28/12/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22320)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/02/1924 19/08/1924 181 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6286
 
Cowlairs Works 29/10/1925 11/11/1925 14 days General  
Cowlairs Works 04/03/1927 27/05/1927 85 days General  
Cowlairs Works 05/11/1927 24/11/1927 20 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 22/06/1928 11/07/1928 20 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 08/11/1928 23/11/1928 16 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 03/10/1929 16/11/1929 45 days General  
Cowlairs Works 26/12/1929 11/01/1930 17 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 19/02/1930 21/02/1930 3 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 28/02/1930 13/03/1930 14 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 23/10/1931 25/11/1931 34 days General  
Cowlairs Works 17/08/1932 25/08/1932 9 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 25/08/1932 07/10/1932 44 days General
New chimney fitted
Boiler number C1468 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1935 13/07/1935 39 days General
Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1937 24/04/1937 23 days General
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1937 11/12/1937 37 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/03/1939 05/05/1939 50 days General
Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1941 01/09/1941 59 days General
Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1944 18/03/1944 40 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1947 22/02/1947 52 days General
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1949 15/10/1949 41 days General
Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63880
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1952 30/08/1952 23 days General
Boiler number 22338 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1952 12/11/1952 28 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1955 07/05/1955 40 days General
Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1957 28/12/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1960 30/07/1960 62 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 18/08/1960 30/08/1960 13 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2112
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22202
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 19/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6286
   
19/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
19/08/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1925. Dep: 11/11/1925.    
04/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1927. Dep: 27/05/1927.    
05/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 24/11/1927.    
22/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/06/1928. Dep: 11/07/1928.    
08/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1928. Dep: 23/11/1928.    
03/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929.    
26/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/12/1929. Dep: 11/01/1930.    
19/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/02/1930. Dep: 21/02/1930.    
28/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1930. Dep: 13/03/1930.    
12/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
09/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
23/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1931. Dep: 25/11/1931.    
17/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1932. Dep: 25/08/1932.    
25/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1932. Dep: 07/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
New chimney fitted
Boiler number C1468 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15)
   
05/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937.    
17/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1939. Dep: 05/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15)
   
05/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1941. Dep: 01/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
08/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3880    
02/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
05/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63880
   
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
11/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
08/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22338 (Diagram 15D)
   
16/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1952. Dep: 12/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
29/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1957. Dep: 28/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D)
   
30/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 30/07/1960.    
18/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1960. Dep: 30/08/1960.    
17/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63880 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev