Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2116 m/e 07/1919
LNER (1924) 6632   17/03/1928
LNER (1946) 3881   08/09/1946
BR 63881 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1919
O4/830/08/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22206
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 17/03/1928
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates 17/03/1928
HLS Hull Springhead 07/04/1930
CUD Cudworth 15/07/1935
YK York (North) 02/10/1940
HTN Heaton 28/03/1943
TDK Tyne Dock 23/07/1945
HTN Heaton 22/07/1946
TDK Tyne Dock 08/09/1946
HLD Hull Dairycoates 06/02/1949
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 02/09/1951
40B Immingham 16/09/1951
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
39B Sheffield Darnall 21/03/1954
41J Langwith Junction 16/09/1962
41A Sheffield Darnall 23/09/1962
   Withdrawn 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 22/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 27/03/1954
WDN   09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 859)
03/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1680)
05/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1856)
04/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 821)
17/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1869)
07/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3413)
17/11/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3252)
24/04/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3361)
25/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22132)
10/01/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22891)
19/02/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22271)
30/08/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28972)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/01/1928 17/03/1928 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6632
 
Darlington Works 26/09/1930 12/11/1930 48 days General  
Gorton Works 26/11/1932 03/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1934 05/01/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1936 04/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1939 25/02/1939 15 days General  
Gorton Works 26/04/1941 17/05/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1943 07/08/1943 17 days General
Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1945 17/11/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1947 30/08/1947 16 days Light Repair
Tender only
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1948 24/04/1948 15 days General
Boiler number 3361 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63881
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1950 25/11/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22132 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1952 10/01/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22891 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1955 19/02/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1958 30/08/1958 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28972 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1958 03/10/1958 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/08/1959 15/08/1959 15 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2116
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22206
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
14/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6632
   
17/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/03/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
26/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1930. Dep: 12/11/1930.    
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 05/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
20/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
   
11/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.    
02/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
26/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1941. Dep: 17/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
22/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
03/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3881    
15/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/08/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
10/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1948. Dep: 24/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3361 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63881
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22132 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
16/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22891 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
22/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1955. Dep: 19/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15)
   
05/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28972 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958.    
01/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/08/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959.    
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63881 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev