|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 14/01/1928 | 17/03/1928 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6632 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1930 | 12/11/1930 | 48 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1932 | 03/12/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1934 | 05/01/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1941 | 17/05/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1943 | 07/08/1943 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1945 | 17/11/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1947 | 30/08/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | Tender only |
||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1948 | 24/04/1948 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3361 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63881 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1950 | 25/11/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22132 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1952 | 10/01/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22891 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1955 | 19/02/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1958 | 30/08/1958 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28972 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1958 | 03/10/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1959 | 15/08/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2116 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22206 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
14/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6632 |
||
17/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/03/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
07/04/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
26/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1930. Dep: 12/11/1930. | ||
26/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1680 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1934. Dep: 05/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
20/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. | ||
02/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
26/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1941. Dep: 17/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
22/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
03/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3881 | ||
15/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/08/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
10/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1948. Dep: 24/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3361 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63881 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
11/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22132 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
16/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
20/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22891 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
21/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
22/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1955. Dep: 19/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28972 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958. | ||
01/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/08/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959. | ||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63881 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |