Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 750 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1790 Week
» 11960 Month
» 289756 Year
» 1174137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2121 m/e 08/1919
LNWR 2978 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 6287   31/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3882   06/04/1946
BR 63882 w/e 14/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1919
O4/423/07/1929
O4/812/08/1947
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22211
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 31/05/1924
Withdrawal Sun 23/05/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
Service Life 45 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Garnham, Harris & Elton,Chesterfeld, 7/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
GOR Gorton 29/05/1924
19D Heaton Mersey 26/10/1940
GOR Gorton 02/12/1940
DON Doncaster 10/12/1944
SHF Sheffield Darnall 25/06/1945
41J Langwith Junction 16/09/1962
41A Sheffield Darnall 23/09/1962
41F Mexborough 16/06/1963
41J Langwith Junction 01/03/1964
   Withdrawn 23/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   w/e 23/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1305)
23/07/1929 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 982)
07/04/1934 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 7506)
22/06/1940 Diagram 2 boiler fitted (number 8459)
12/08/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5029)
14/01/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5017)
24/05/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28381)
17/03/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28382)
14/01/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28891)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/1924 31/05/1924   Heavy  
Gorton Works 06/05/1927 16/06/1927 42 days General  
Gorton Works 09/03/1929 23/07/1929 137 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/4
Boiler number 982 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1931 22/09/1931 34 days General  
Gorton Works 29/01/1934 07/04/1934 69 days General
Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 29/02/1936 18/04/1936 50 days General  
Gorton Works 27/06/1938 24/09/1938 90 days General  
Gorton Works 09/05/1940 22/06/1940 45 days General
Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1943 20/02/1943 38 days General  
Gorton Works 08/10/1944 11/11/1944 35 days General  
Gorton Works 17/03/1946 13/04/1946 28 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3882
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1947 12/08/1947 87 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5029 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1949 14/01/1950 40 days General
Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63882
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1950 19/01/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/09/1951 20/09/1951 2 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 28/04/1952 24/05/1952 27 days General
Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1952 28/05/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 10/02/1955 17/03/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1958 14/01/1959 44 days General
Boiler number 28891 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1962 21/02/1962 30 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2121
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22211
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2978    
29/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6287    
31/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/07/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924.    
06/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1927. Dep: 16/06/1927.    
09/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 23/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/4
Boiler number 982 (Diagram 2)
   
20/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1931. Dep: 22/09/1931.    
29/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2)
   
29/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 18/04/1936.    
27/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938.    
09/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1940. Dep: 22/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2)
   
26/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
02/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943.    
08/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944.    
10/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
17/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3882
   
18/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1947. Dep: 12/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5029 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1949. Dep: 14/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63882
   
17/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 19/01/1950.    
19/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1951. Dep: 20/09/1951.    
28/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1952. Dep: 28/05/1952.    
10/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1955. Dep: 17/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1958. Dep: 14/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28891 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1962. Dep: 21/02/1962.    
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
01/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63882 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev