Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2126 m/e 08/1919
LNER (1924) 6633   24/05/1927
LNER (1946) 3884   10/11/1946
BR 63884 w/e 04/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1919
O4/720/04/1940
O4/809/02/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22216
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 24/05/1927
Withdrawal Tue 09/06/1964 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 8/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 24/05/1927
DON Doncaster 08/01/1938
IMM Immingham 17/01/1938
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 23/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 12/01/1943
THJ Thornton Junction 25/01/1943
DON Doncaster 02/10/1943
ARD Ardsley 11/06/1944
MEX Mexborough 18/08/1946
DON Doncaster 20/10/1947
40E Langwith Junction 25/06/1950
38D Staveley (G.C.) 02/12/1951
41F Mexborough 31/01/1960
36C Frodingham 03/12/1961
   Withdrawn 09/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   09/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1035)
07/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1168)
12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1960)
05/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1859)
11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1225)
20/04/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3665)
26/02/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3687)
10/03/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3666)
02/12/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3684)
02/12/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22310)
09/08/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22305)
06/11/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22331)
09/02/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28832)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/04/1927 24/05/1927 25 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6633
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1929 20/07/1929 8 days General  
Gorton Works 11/07/1931 20/07/1931 10 days General  
Gorton Works 25/11/1933 07/12/1933 13 days General
Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1935 05/12/1935 18 days General
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1937 11/1937   General
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1940 20/04/1940 9 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1943 26/02/1943 32 days General
Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1945 10/03/1945 51 days General
Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1947 02/12/1947 39 days General
Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1949 02/02/1950 49 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR 63884
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1950 02/12/1950 28 days General
Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1950 07/12/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 28/06/1952 09/08/1952 43 days General
Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1954 06/11/1954 34 days General
Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1956 09/02/1957 59 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1960 09/04/1960 34 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 12/04/1960 27/04/1960 16 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/03/1962 19/04/1962 29 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2126
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22216
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 24/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6633
   
24/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/05/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 20/07/1929.    
07/07/1931 Modification Diagram 15 number 1168 boiler fitted    
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 20/07/1931.    
25/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 07/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1935. Dep: 05/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1937. Dep: ?/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
12/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
12/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
25/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
26/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1943. Dep: 26/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
11/06/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
19/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3884    
20/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 02/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D)
   
16/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1949. Dep: 02/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63884
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
05/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1950. Dep: 02/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1950. Dep: 07/12/1950.    
02/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
28/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D)
   
04/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D)
   
13/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1956. Dep: 09/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
07/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1960. Dep: 09/04/1960.    
12/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 27/04/1960.    
03/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
22/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962.    
09/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63884 from Frodingham (36C)    
08/11/1964 Sightings A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed John Thickitt Link

prev prev