|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 30/04/1927 | 24/05/1927 | 25 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6633 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1929 | 20/07/1929 | 8 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1931 | 20/07/1931 | 10 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1933 | 07/12/1933 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1935 | 05/12/1935 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1937 | 11/1937 | General | Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
|||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 9 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1943 | 26/02/1943 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1947 | 02/12/1947 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1949 | 02/02/1950 | 49 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 63884 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1950 | 02/12/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1950 | 07/12/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1952 | 09/08/1952 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1954 | 06/11/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1956 | 09/02/1957 | 59 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1960 | 09/04/1960 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1960 | 27/04/1960 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1962 | 19/04/1962 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2126 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22216 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
30/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 24/05/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6633 |
||
24/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/05/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
13/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 20/07/1929. | ||
07/07/1931 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1168 boiler fitted | ||
11/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 20/07/1931. | ||
25/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 07/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1960 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1935. Dep: 05/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1937. Dep: ?/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3665 (Diagram 15D) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
12/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
25/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
26/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1943. Dep: 26/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3666 (Diagram 15D) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3884 | ||
20/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 02/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 15D) |
||
16/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1949. Dep: 02/02/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63884 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
05/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1950. Dep: 02/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1950. Dep: 07/12/1950. | ||
02/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
28/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22305 (Diagram 15D) |
||
04/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22331 (Diagram 15D) |
||
13/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1956. Dep: 09/02/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28832 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
07/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1960. Dep: 09/04/1960. | ||
12/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 27/04/1960. | ||
03/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
22/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962. | ||
09/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63884 from Frodingham (36C) |