Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2132 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6634   21/07/1928
LNER (1946) 3885   11/05/1946
BR 63885 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/309/1919
O4/820/10/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22222
To Service During 09/1919
Taken into Stock 24/07/1928
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 42 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 18/8/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 24/07/1928
GRA Grantham 07/11/1928
NWE New England 19/01/1931
CLK Colwick 14/05/1931
LNG Langwith Junction 18/05/1931
TUX Tuxford 10/07/1939
37A Ardsley 27/09/1953
   Withdrawn 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1097)
07/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1440)
18/11/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 868)
12/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 518)
21/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1174)
14/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3291)
31/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 549)
20/11/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3222)
11/05/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3338)
19/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3406)
04/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22124)
25/04/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22133)
20/10/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28922)
17/12/1960 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/05/1928 21/07/1928 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6634
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1931 07/03/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1933 18/11/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1935 12/10/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1937 21/08/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1939 14/10/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1942 31/01/1942 23 days General
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 13/07/1942 13/08/1942 32 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 09/11/1943 20/11/1943 12 days General
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1946 11/05/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3885
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1948 19/06/1948 15 days General
Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63885
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22124 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1953 25/04/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1953 30/04/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 08/05/1953 13/05/1953 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/09/1956 20/10/1956 50 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28922 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1958 04/10/1958 47 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 19/11/1960 17/12/1960 29 days Heavy Intermediate
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1962 10/03/1962 36 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2132
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22222
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
05/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1928. Dep: 21/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6634
   
24/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
24/07/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
19/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
21/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 07/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/05/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
11/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15)
   
14/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
   
10/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
07/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
   
09/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1942. Dep: 31/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
   
13/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1942. Dep: 13/08/1942.    
09/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15)
   
20/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3885
   
05/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63885
   
21/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22124 (Diagram 15)
   
04/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15)
   
28/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1953. Dep: 30/04/1953.    
08/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1953. Dep: 13/05/1953.    
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
01/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1956. Dep: 20/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28922 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958.    
19/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
03/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/02/1962. Dep: 10/03/1962.    
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63885 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev