|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/05/1928 | 21/07/1928 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6634 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1931 | 07/03/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1933 | 18/11/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1935 | 12/10/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1937 | 21/08/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1939 | 14/10/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1942 | 31/01/1942 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/07/1942 | 13/08/1942 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1946 | 11/05/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3885 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1948 | 19/06/1948 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63885 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1950 | 04/11/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22124 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1953 | 30/04/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1953 | 13/05/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1956 | 20/10/1956 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28922 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1958 | 04/10/1958 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1962 | 10/03/1962 | 36 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2132 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22222 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
05/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1928. Dep: 21/07/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6634 |
||
24/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
24/07/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
07/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
19/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
21/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 07/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
18/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
11/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 518 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX) | ||
07/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1942. Dep: 31/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1942. Dep: 13/08/1942. | ||
09/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3222 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3885 |
||
05/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3406 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63885 |
||
21/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22124 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1953. Dep: 30/04/1953. | ||
08/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1953. Dep: 13/05/1953. | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
01/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1956. Dep: 20/10/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28922 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1958. Dep: 04/10/1958. | ||
19/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
03/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/02/1962. Dep: 10/03/1962. | ||
08/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63885 from Ardsley (56B) |