Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 129 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7870 Week
» 28312 Month
» 365158 Year
» 1586723 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2133 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6635   22/09/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3886   03/08/1946
British Railways 63886 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/309/1919
O103/08/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22223
To Service During 09/1919
Taken into Stock 25/09/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/10/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 43 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1919
NWE New England on 25/09/1928
BOS Boston on 02/07/1929
NWE New England on 21/08/1929
CLK Colwick on 18/12/1935
GRA Grantham on 28/12/1935
MEX Mexborough on 21/11/1942
WFD Woodford Halse on 07/09/1944
GOR Gorton on 04/08/1946
38B Annesley on 22/10/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 27/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 28/10/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 27/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 929)
19/09/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 512)
23/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1873)
21/03/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
21/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3234)
31/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1367)
09/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1259)
18/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1065)
03/08/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5080)
06/11/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5057)
04/08/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28335)
14/11/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28345)
24/09/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28812)
08/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28838)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 22/09/1928 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6635
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1931 19/09/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1933 23/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 21/03/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1938 31/12/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1941 09/08/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1944 18/03/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1946 03/08/1946 113 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5080 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3886
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1948 06/11/1948 35 days General
Boiler number 5057 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63886
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1951 04/08/1951 48 days General
Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1951 09/08/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/09/1951 03/11/1951 38 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 22/09/1952 24/10/1952 33 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 23/10/1953 14/11/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1955 24/09/1955 48 days General
Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1957 08/06/1957 31 days General
Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1958 14/06/1958 18 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 01/08/1958 30/08/1958 30 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 18/02/1960 23/03/1960 35 days Heavy Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2133
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22223
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 22/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6635
   
25/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
25/09/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
02/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
21/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
22/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1931. Dep: 19/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
   
18/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
28/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
07/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
17/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
04/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
13/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5080 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3886
   
04/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5057 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63886
   
22/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
18/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 09/08/1951.    
27/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951.    
22/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952.    
23/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28345 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1957. Dep: 08/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28838 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1958. Dep: 14/06/1958.    
01/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/08/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958.    
18/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/02/1960. Dep: 23/03/1960.    
27/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63886 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev