|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/10/1927 | 09/11/1927 | 19 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6639 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1929 | 04/01/1930 | 8 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1932 | 14/08/1932 | 12 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1935 | 16/04/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 1937 | 28/08/1937 | General | Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1940 | 01/1940 | General | Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15) |
|||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1944 | 12/08/1944 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 113 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5079 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3890 |
||
Gorton Works | 1947 | 01/1947 | Unclassified | Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1948 | 26/06/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 5049 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63890 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1950 | 13/01/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1954 | 23/10/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1955 | 30/07/1955 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1957 | 09/03/1957 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1960 | 21/01/1961 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1961 | 03/02/1962 | 50 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2144 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22234 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2846 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 09/11/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6639 |
||
09/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/11/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
28/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 04/01/1930. | ||
08/1932 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1211 boiler fitted | ||
03/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1932. Dep: 14/08/1932. | ||
02/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1935. Dep: 16/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15) |
||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15) |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: ?/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
20/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
28/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
23/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5079 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3890 |
||
14/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: ?/01/1947. Work undertaken: Drop Grate fitted |
||
27/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5049 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63890 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
23/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/06/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955. | ||
08/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. | ||
14/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1960. Dep: 21/01/1961. | ||
16/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1961. Dep: 03/02/1962. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
17/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63890 from March (31B) |