Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 351 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 351 Week
» 17687 Month
» 295483 Year
» 1179864 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2145 m/e 05/1919
LNWR 2847 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6295   21/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3891   06/08/1946
BR 63891 w/e 14/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1919
O4/720/03/1943
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22235
To Service During 05/1919
Taken into Stock 21/06/1924
Withdrawal Wed 13/09/1961 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 42 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 21/06/1924
MAR March 08/03/1929
LIN Lincoln 15/08/1930
MAR March 14/10/1930
CLK Colwick 30/01/1936
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 22/11/1940
GOR Gorton 30/01/1943
LNG Langwith Junction 20/03/1943
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
39A Gorton 21/05/1950
38A Colwick 13/06/1954
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn 13/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 21/05/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   13/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1288)
14/02/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1127)
26/08/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1457)
07/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1021)
28/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1010)
15/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3400)
20/03/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3688)
22/09/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3658)
31/08/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3681)
13/08/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3686)
29/09/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22322)
14/11/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22318)
15/09/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22330)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/04/1924 21/06/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6295
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1926 06/11/1926 78 days General  
Gorton Works 26/01/1929 23/02/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 31/01/1931 14/02/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1127 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1933 26/08/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1935 07/12/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1938 28/05/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1940 15/06/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1943 20/03/1943 25 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1945 22/09/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1946 31/08/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1948 13/08/1948 37 days General
Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63891
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1949 28/05/1949 29 days General  
Gorton Works 01/09/1951 29/09/1951 29 days General
Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1951 06/10/1951 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/10/1953 14/11/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1953 19/11/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/09/1954 20/10/1954 48 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 08/12/1954 29/01/1955 53 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 01/02/1955 03/02/1955 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/08/1956 15/09/1956 36 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1957 09/11/1957 35 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 07/09/1961 07/09/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2145
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22235
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2847    
08/1921 Allocation      
12/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6295
   
21/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
21/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1926. Dep: 06/11/1926.    
26/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1929. Dep: 23/02/1929.    
08/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
15/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
14/10/1930 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
31/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 14/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1127 (Diagram 15)
   
19/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1933. Dep: 26/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 28/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15)
   
22/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
30/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
08/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3891    
17/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63891
   
30/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949.    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
01/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1951. Dep: 29/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951.    
24/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D)
   
17/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1953. Dep: 19/11/1953.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
03/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1954. Dep: 20/10/1954.    
08/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955.    
01/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1955. Dep: 03/02/1955.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
11/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1956. Dep: 15/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D)
   
06/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957.    
07/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/09/1961. Dep: 07/09/1961.    
13/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63891 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev