Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2147 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2842 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6297   26/04/1924
War Dept. 785   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22237
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 26/04/1924
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 785 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 25/04/1924
IMM Immingham 03/05/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 15/12/1926
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 05/01/1930
   Withdrawn 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1169)
29/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1224)
22/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1242)
02/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1077)
05/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1443)
02/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1024)
23/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3250)
18/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3423)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 26/04/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6297
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1926 20/11/1926 64 days General  
Gorton Works 23/02/1929 29/06/1929 127 days General
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1931 22/08/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1933 02/09/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1935 05/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1937 02/10/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1939 23/09/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1941 18/10/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 3423 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 785
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2147
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22237
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2842    
08/1921 Allocation      
16/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6297
   
25/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
03/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
18/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926.    
15/12/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
23/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15)
   
05/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
25/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 22/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1242 (Diagram 15)
   
19/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
   
04/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3423 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 785
   
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 785 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    

prev prev