Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 942 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5073 Week
» 15243 Month
» 293039 Year
» 1177420 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2148 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2852 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6293   10/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3893   28/07/1946
BR (Tmp) E3893   17/02/1948
BR 63893 w/e 14/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/822/12/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22238
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 10/05/1924
Withdrawal Sun 20/06/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 46 yrs , 20 dys
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 8/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 06/05/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 15/04/1945
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
38A Colwick 08/10/1950
40E Langwith Junction 11/05/1952
40D Tuxford 09/01/1955
41J Langwith Junction 01/02/1959
   Withdrawn 20/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   w/e 20/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1168)
02/03/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1881)
11/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1943)
12/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 864)
06/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1876)
13/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 828)
13/06/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
24/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1964)
22/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3366)
11/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3225)
20/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 864)
22/12/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5029)
31/03/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5097)
14/05/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5004)
14/04/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28310)
28/05/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28395)
30/11/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28118)
12/01/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28802)
14/12/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28385)
07/02/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28897)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1924 10/05/1924   Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6293
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1926 02/03/1927 118 days General
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1929 11/06/1929 46 days General
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1931 12/05/1931 60 days General
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1933 06/05/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1935 13/06/1935 63 days General
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1936 24/10/1936 38 days General
Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1939 22/04/1939 37 days General
Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1940 11/01/1941 37 days General
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1943 20/02/1943 44 days General
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1944 22/12/1944 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5029 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1947 31/03/1947 53 days General
Boiler number 5097 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/01/1948 17/02/1948 48 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3893
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1949 14/05/1949 41 days General
Boiler number 5004 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63893
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1951 14/04/1951 46 days General
Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1951 20/04/1951 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/04/1953 28/05/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1954 30/11/1954 40 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1955 12/01/1956 39 days General
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1957 14/12/1957 26 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1959 07/02/1959 37 days General
Boiler number 28897 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1962 06/06/1962 41 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2148
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22238
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2852    
08/1921 Allocation      
1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6293
   
06/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1926. Dep: 02/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
   
27/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 11/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15)
   
14/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 12/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15)
   
12/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1935. Dep: 13/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
17/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
   
17/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15)
   
06/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
   
17/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1944. Dep: 22/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5029 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
28/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3893    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1947. Dep: 31/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5097 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
01/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/01/1948. Dep: 17/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3893
   
04/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5004 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63893
   
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
28/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 20/04/1951.    
11/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
30/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1954. Dep: 30/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
05/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 12/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28897 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
27/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/04/1962. Dep: 06/06/1962.    
20/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63893 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev