Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2149 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2843 m/e 09/1919
GCR 1300c   05/01/1924
LNER (1924) 6300   17/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3894   01/06/1946
BR 63894 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/717/02/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22239
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 05/01/1924
Withdrawal Mon 11/07/1960 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 08/01/1924
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 20/07/1940
GOR Gorton 06/08/1940
19D Heaton Mersey 26/10/1940
GOR Gorton 01/12/1940
ANN Annesley 07/01/1945
CLK Colwick 19/09/1948
ANN Annesley 28/11/1948
CLK Colwick 18/12/1949
38B Annesley 02/09/1951
38A Colwick 31/08/1952
36B Mexborough 29/01/1956
   Withdrawn 11/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 25/09/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   w/e 11/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1143)
17/05/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1964)
27/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1860)
27/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1166)
26/08/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1745)
31/08/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
31/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1026)
31/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1298)
17/02/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3661)
07/11/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3657)
30/09/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3679)
01/06/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3676)
04/10/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 5101)
20/11/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3692)
14/04/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22317)
28/11/1953 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22315)
19/05/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22306)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 05/01/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to GCR 1300c
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1924 17/05/1924 78 days General
Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6300
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1927 16/04/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 15/06/1929 27/07/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1931 27/06/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1166 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1933 26/08/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1935 31/08/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 17/07/1937 31/07/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1940 17/02/1940 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1942 07/11/1942 16 days General
Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1944 30/09/1944 13 days General
Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1946 01/06/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3894
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1947 04/10/1947 8 days Heavy
Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1948 20/11/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3692 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63894
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1951 14/04/1951 29 days General
Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1952 02/08/1952 57 days Heavy Casual  
Gorton Works 05/08/1952 07/08/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/11/1953 28/11/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1953 09/12/1953 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 28/05/1955 11/06/1955 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 21/06/1955 22/06/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 21/04/1956 19/05/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1956 11/06/1956 18 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 02/06/1960 02/06/1960 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2149
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22239
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2843    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1300c
   
05/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
08/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6300
   
26/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927.    
15/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15)
   
06/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1166 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1933. Dep: 26/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
17/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15)
   
20/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D)
   
20/07/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
06/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
01/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D)
   
18/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D)
   
07/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
11/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3894
   
27/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/09/1947. Dep: 04/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D)
   
19/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1948. Dep: 20/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3692 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63894
   
28/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
07/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1952. Dep: 02/08/1952.    
05/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 07/08/1952.    
31/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
14/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 09/12/1953.    
28/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955.    
21/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1955. Dep: 22/06/1955.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
21/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D)
   
25/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1956. Dep: 11/06/1956.    
02/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/06/1960. Dep: 02/06/1960.    
11/07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 63894 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev