|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1923 | 05/01/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1300c |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1924 | 17/05/1924 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6300 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1927 | 16/04/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1929 | 27/07/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1931 | 27/06/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1166 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1933 | 26/08/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1935 | 31/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 17/07/1937 | 31/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1940 | 17/02/1940 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1942 | 07/11/1942 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3894 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1947 | 04/10/1947 | 8 days | Heavy | Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1948 | 20/11/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3692 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63894 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1951 | 14/04/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1952 | 02/08/1952 | 57 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1952 | 07/08/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1953 | 09/12/1953 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1955 | 11/06/1955 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1955 | 22/06/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1956 | 19/05/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1956 | 11/06/1956 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1960 | 02/06/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2149 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22239 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2843 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
22/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 05/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1300c |
||
05/01/1924 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
08/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6300 |
||
26/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927. | ||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1166 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1933. Dep: 26/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
17/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 17/02/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3661 (Diagram 15D) |
||
20/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
06/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
26/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
01/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
23/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3657 (Diagram 15D) |
||
18/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D) |
||
07/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3894 |
||
27/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/09/1947. Dep: 04/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D) |
||
19/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1948. Dep: 20/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3692 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63894 |
||
28/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
04/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
07/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1952. Dep: 02/08/1952. | ||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 07/08/1952. | ||
31/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
14/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22315 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 09/12/1953. | ||
28/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955. | ||
21/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1955. Dep: 22/06/1955. | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
21/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22306 (Diagram 15D) |
||
25/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1956. Dep: 11/06/1956. | ||
02/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/06/1960. Dep: 02/06/1960. | ||
11/07/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63894 from Mexborough (41F) |