Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 366 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7373 Week
» 13507 Month
» 241391 Year
» 1462956 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2150 m/e 06/1919
LNWR 2840 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6296   12/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3895   03/08/1946
BR 63895 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/819/02/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22240
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 12/07/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 7/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1919
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 08/07/1924
CLK Colwick 03/02/1926
LNG Langwith Junction 16/09/1927
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 28/03/1948
39A Gorton 16/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 16/07/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1178)
31/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1366)
16/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1077)
12/08/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1217)
09/11/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
09/11/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
09/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1139)
20/11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1859)
08/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3336)
13/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1949)
17/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1187)
13/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3243)
18/02/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1256)
24/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22271)
19/02/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28395)
12/10/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28378)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/04/1924 12/07/1924 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6296
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1927 30/04/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 31/08/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1931 16/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1933 12/08/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1935 09/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1937 20/11/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1940 08/06/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 28/12/1942 13/02/1943 48 days General
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1944 18/03/1944 3 days Light Repair
Tender only
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1945 17/03/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1947 13/12/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1948 07/08/1948 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63895
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1950 18/02/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1952 24/05/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/12/1954 19/02/1955 57 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1957 12/10/1957 29 days General
Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1957 22/10/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/11/1957 05/11/1957 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 10/10/1959 09/11/1959 31 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2150
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22240
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2840    
08/1921 Allocation      
12/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6296
   
08/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/07/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
03/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927.    
16/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
27/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15)
   
25/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 16/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
13/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1937. Dep: 20/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
   
28/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
   
16/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
17/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3895    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
15/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 13/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63895
   
28/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1950. Dep: 18/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
   
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
10/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15)
   
25/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1954. Dep: 19/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1957. Dep: 22/10/1957.    
01/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1957. Dep: 05/11/1957.    
10/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/10/1959. Dep: 09/11/1959.    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63895 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev