|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/12/1925 | 20/02/1926 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6530 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1929 | 06/04/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1931 | 20/06/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1934 | 31/03/1934 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1936 | 18/07/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1939 | 21/01/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1941 | 08/02/1941 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3340 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2152 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22242 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2841 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
26/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6530 |
||
16/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/02/1926 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
02/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 06/04/1929. | ||
23/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934. | ||
04/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 21/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3340 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 727 from Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 727 |