Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 179 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 179 Week
» 14083 Month
» 322064 Year
» 1206445 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 2153 m/e 06/1919
LNER (1924) 6254   01/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3897   18/08/1946
BR 63897 w/e 20/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/801/02/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22243
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 01/03/1924
Withdrawal Wed 22/05/1963 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 24/5/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 03/03/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 14/03/1924
GOR Gorton 23/12/1924
DON Doncaster 26/02/1925
CLK Colwick 07/09/1943
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
MAR March 08/09/1944
CAM Cambridge 22/12/1947
MAR March 08/02/1948
36B Mexborough 28/10/1951
36C Frodingham 03/12/1961
   Withdrawn 22/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC MAR March w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   22/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1274)
18/12/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1295)
20/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1054)
24/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1209)
03/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1175)
13/06/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
13/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1132)
13/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
23/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3241)
30/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1308)
24/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3395)
07/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1067)
20/04/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 814)
20/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3392)
05/07/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22139)
01/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28432)
15/05/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28884)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/07/1924 01/03/1924 -127 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/08/1924 18/12/1924 125 days General
Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1927 17/09/1927 59 days General  
Gorton Works 15/03/1929 20/06/1929 98 days General
Boiler number 1054 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1931 24/07/1931 54 days General
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1934 03/03/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1936 13/06/1936 35 days General
Boiler number 1132 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1938 23/07/1938 53 days General
Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1940 30/11/1940 51 days General
Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1943 24/04/1943 70 days General
Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1944 07/04/1944 20 days General
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1946 20/04/1947 151 days General
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1949 20/08/1949 24 days General
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63897
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1952 05/07/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 22139 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1954 05/11/1954 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/12/1955 01/02/1956 61 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28432 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1959 15/05/1959 28 days General
Boiler number 28884 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2153
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22243
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6254    
01/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
03/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
07/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1924. Dep: 01/03/1924.    
16/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 18/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15)
   
23/12/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
21/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927.    
15/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1929. Dep: 20/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1054 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1931. Dep: 24/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15)
   
27/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15)
   
10/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1132 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
01/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15)
   
11/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15)
   
14/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3897    
21/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1946. Dep: 20/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
08/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
28/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63897
   
28/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
12/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22139 (Diagram 15)
   
23/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/10/1954. Dep: 05/11/1954.    
03/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1955. Dep: 01/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28432 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28884 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
22/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63897 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev