|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/07/1924 | 01/03/1924 | -127 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1924 | 18/12/1924 | 125 days | General | Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1927 | 17/09/1927 | 59 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1929 | 20/06/1929 | 98 days | General | Boiler number 1054 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1931 | 24/07/1931 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1934 | 03/03/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1936 | 13/06/1936 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1132 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1938 | 23/07/1938 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1943 | 24/04/1943 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1944 | 07/04/1944 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1946 | 20/04/1947 | 151 days | General | Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1949 | 20/08/1949 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63897 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1952 | 05/07/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 22139 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1954 | 05/11/1954 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1955 | 01/02/1956 | 61 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28432 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1959 | 15/05/1959 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28884 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2153 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22243 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/03/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6254 | ||
01/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
03/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
07/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1924. Dep: 01/03/1924. | ||
16/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 18/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1295 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
26/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927. | ||
15/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1929. Dep: 20/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1054 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1931. Dep: 24/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1175 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1132 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
01/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1308 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1067 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3897 | ||
21/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1946. Dep: 20/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
08/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
14/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
28/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63897 |
||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
12/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22139 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/10/1954. Dep: 05/11/1954. | ||
03/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1955. Dep: 01/02/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28432 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28884 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
22/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63897 from Frodingham (36C) |