Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 143 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7884 Week
» 28326 Month
» 365172 Year
» 1586737 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2157 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6253   12/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3898   18/08/1946
British Railways 63898 w/e 31/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O4/821/04/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22247
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 12/04/1924
Withdrawal Thu 02/05/1963 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy
Information Atlas Works

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 28/5/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1919
GOR Gorton on 16/04/1924
DON Doncaster on 17/01/1925
GOR Gorton on 12/11/1931
DON Doncaster on 04/12/1931
CLK Colwick on 07/09/1943
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
MAR March on 07/09/1944
CAM Cambridge on 22/12/1947
MEX Mexborough on 13/01/1950
36C Frodingham on 10/12/1961
   Withdrawn on 02/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 3w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   on 02/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1414)
10/12/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1204)
12/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1126)
03/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1086)
15/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
15/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 856)
15/05/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
06/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3340)
18/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3429)
31/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3211)
15/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 924)
21/04/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3202)
31/12/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3366)
09/08/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22283)
21/04/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28892)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 12/04/1924 22 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6253
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1924 08/01/1925 153 days General  
Gorton Works 21/05/1927 11/07/1927 52 days General  
Gorton Works 02/09/1929 10/12/1929 100 days General
Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1931 12/11/1931 45 days General
Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/12/1933 03/02/1934 39 days General
Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1936 15/05/1936 32 days General
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1938 06/08/1938 47 days General
Boiler number 3340 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1940 18/01/1941 20 days General
Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1942 31/01/1943 61 days General
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 07/02/1943 10/04/1943 63 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 14/03/1944 15/04/1944 33 days General
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1946 21/04/1947 141 days General
Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1949 31/12/1949 35 days General
Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63898
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1950 04/01/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/07/1952 09/08/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 22283 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1952 15/08/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 07/02/1956 21/04/1956 75 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28892 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1959 13/11/1959 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 25/06/1962 05/07/1962 11 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2157
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22247
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6253
   
12/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
16/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1924. Dep: 08/01/1925.    
17/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
21/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1927. Dep: 11/07/1927.    
02/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1929. Dep: 10/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1931. Dep: 12/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15)
   
12/11/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/12/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1933. Dep: 03/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1086 (Diagram 15)
   
14/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1936. Dep: 15/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
21/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3340 (Diagram 15)
   
30/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1942. Dep: 31/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15)
   
07/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943.    
07/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3898    
02/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1946. Dep: 21/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3202 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
27/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1949. Dep: 31/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63898
   
03/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1950. Dep: 04/01/1950.    
13/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22283 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1952. Dep: 15/08/1952.    
07/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28892 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/10/1959. Dep: 13/11/1959.    
10/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
25/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1962. Dep: 05/07/1962.    
02/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63898 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev